|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3175.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2225.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1468.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|