|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2066.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 1612.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/05/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|