|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 2754.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1917.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1359.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|