|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6709.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4837.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 29. Page 1721.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1453.).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|