|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1664.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2051.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and RULES.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|