05/21/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1368.) | |||
05/06/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/05/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |||
03/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/26/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Read first time. To print. |