|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3349.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2224.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1955.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|