|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1460.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/05/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|