02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 4). | |||
05/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
05/20/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/26/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Read first time. To print. |