|
11/30/2010
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1956.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|