02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/05/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
04/23/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/26/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Read first time. To print. |