California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB598 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/05/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 598AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member De La Torre FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Division 110.5 (commencing with Section 130350) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 598, as amended, De La Torre. California Health Information Network. Existing law establishes the Office of Health Information Integrity within the California Health and Human Services Agency to ensure the enforcement of state law mandating confidentiality of medical information and to impose administrative fines for the unauthorized use of medical information. This bill would establish the California Health Information Network and the California Health Information Standards Advisory Board within the California Health and Human Services Agency with prescribed duties related to making recommendations for the adoption of health information exchange standards and would require the secretary to report  annually   no later than July 1, 2010,  to the Governor and the Legislature regarding progress at meeting the goals of the bill, including, but not limited to, recommendations relating to necessary statutory changes. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Division 110.5 (commencing with Section 130350) is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: DIVISION 110.5. THE CALIFORNIA HEALTH INFORMATION NETWORK 130350. (a) There is within the California Health and Human Services Agency, the California Health Information Network. (b) The network shall review and, after public hearings for the purpose of receiving input from all interested parties, recommend adoption of health information exchange standards to the Governor and the Legislature. (c) The Secretary of the California Health and Human Services Agency shall administer the network. (d) The goal of the standards developed by the network shall be the accomplishment of all of the following: (1) Establishment and maintenance of an electronic, value-added, network to link the health care community participants in the state for the purpose of interchanging important financial and clinical information. (2) Standardization of health care transactions, health care reporting, electronic interface development, and health care communications services. (3) Gathering and providing data to a statewide data repository. (4) Conducting educational programs consistent with the purposes of this division. (5) Providing charitable services that lessen the burdens of government by providing data to help state agencies fulfill their responsibilities as legislatively mandated. (6) Developing capabilities for standards-based, secure data exchange in compliance with federal standards. (7) Improving the coordination of health care information among hospitals, laboratories, physicians' offices, pharmacies, and other health care providers. (8) Ensuring appropriate information is available at the time and place of care. (9) Ensuring that consumers' health information is secure and confidential. (10) Providing consumers with access to their health information from electronic health records and other sources, and providing new capabilities for consumers to manage and control their personal health records. (11) Supporting the delivery of appropriate evidence-based medical care and reducing the risks associated with medical errors. (12) Lowering health care costs resulting from inefficiencies, medical errors, and incomplete patient information. 130351. (a) There is within the California Health and Human Services Agency, the California Health Information Standards Advisory Board composed of representatives from all of the following: (1) The Department of Finance. (2) The Department of Insurance. (3) The Department of Managed Health Care. (4) The Office of Health Information Integrity. (5) The California Association of Health Plans. (6) The California Association of Physician Groups. (7) The California Hospital Association. (8) The California Medical Association.  (9) The California Primary Care Association.   (10) The California Pharmacists Association.   (11) A labor union organization whose membership has experience and expertise related to health care information exchange.   (12) A business association whose membership provides health care to its employees.  (b) The advisory board shall provide the secretary with recommendations relating to every component of the secretary's duties under this division. 130352. The secretary shall report  annually   no later than July 1, 2010,  to the Governor and the Legislature on its progress in implementing this division, including, but not limited to, recommended statutory changes necessary to accomplish the goals set forth in this division.