|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. pursuant to Asssembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6690.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4822.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|