02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/03/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1976.). | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/18/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 12). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/26/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Read first time. To print. |