|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 6788.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 4591.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Yee.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1625.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|