|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|