|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2009.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|