|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1377.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|