|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1963.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 1544.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|