|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 367, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2981.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2072.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 1930.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|