California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB628 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 26, 2009
Bill August 20, 2009
Bill July 7, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009