|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1374.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 624.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|