|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3814.)
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|