|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 30). Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6860.) (Corrected September 13.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6819.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4963.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1445.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|