LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB639
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB639
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB639
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
10/30/2009
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
10/26/2009
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
04/16/2009
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and HEALTH.
02/26/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
02/25/2009
Read first time. To print.