|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1740.).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|