|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 3118.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2127.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2057.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|