|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1983.).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|