|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2603.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1765.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|