|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 3903.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|