California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB657 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/10/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 657ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hernandez FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 127162 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 657, Hernandez. Health professions workforce: master plan. Existing law requires the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development to take various actions related to statewide health planning and the development of policies to address health care issues in California. This bill would require the office, in collaboration with the California Workforce Investment Board, to establish the Health Professions Workforce Task Force composed of specified members, to assist in the development of a health professions workforce master plan for the state, and would prescribe the functions and duties of the task force in that regard. The bill would require the task force to submit a complete statewide health professions workforce master plan to the office and the Legislature. This bill would also require the task force to seek, and the office to accept, funds from the federal government and private entities for purposes of implementing the bill. The bill would prohibit state funds from being used to implement the bill. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 127162 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 127162. (a) The office shall, in collaboration with the California Workforce Investment Board and based on information provided by the health care workforce clearinghouse created by Section 128050, establish the Health Professions Workforce Task Force to assist in the development of a health professions workforce master plan for the state. The task force shall be composed of the following members from both rural and urban areas: (1) Two members representing the Legislature, with one member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, and one member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (2) At the discretion of the Regents of the University of California, a member representing, and appointed by, the Regents of the University of California. (3) A member representing the California State University, as appointed by the Governor. (4) A member representing the California Community Colleges, as appointed by the Governor. (5) A member representing a California independent or private postsecondary institution, as appointed by the Governor. (6) A member representing the State Department of Education, as appointed by the Governor. (7) A member responsible for leading a health sciences program in a school district, drawn from a pool of candidates selected by the Superintendent, as appointed by the Governor. (8) Three members representing key stakeholders from labor, health insurers, and medical groups, as appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (9) Three members representing the community clinics and hospitals in the state, as appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (10) Three members representing community-based organizations in the state, as appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (11) Three members representing multiple health professions, including nursing and allied health, as appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (12) A member of the California Workforce Investment Board and a member of a regional workforce investment board, as appointed by the Governor. (b) Total membership of the task force shall be not more than 22 people. (c) Membership on the task force shall be voluntary and without compensation. (d) The task force shall assist the office in the development of a health professions workforce master plan, and shall hold its first meeting no later than October 31, 2010, to do all of the following: (1) Report, assess impact, and review capacity and effectiveness of existing state and private workforce training programs to leverage funding resources and form new partnerships, foster shared learning, identify best practices, and minimize duplication of efforts. (2) Review local workforce investment plans and assess progress toward meeting current health professions workforce needs. (3) Identify education and employment trends in the health professions. (4) Identify the 10 health professions with the highest demand and develop a plan to meet that demand. (5) Recommend state policies needed to address the issues of health professions workforce shortage and distribution. (6) Compile, assess, and align with other strategic plans for developing California's health workforce. (e) The task force shall meet no less than three times per year. (f) Not later than October 31, 2013, the task force shall submit a complete statewide health professions workforce master plan to the office and the Legislature. (g) The office shall act as the lead in coordinating the task force. (h) The task force shall seek, and the office shall accept, funds from the federal government and private entities for the purpose of implementing this section. No state funds, including, but not limited to, moneys from the General Fund or any special fund, shall be used to implement this section.