10/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2009. | |||
10/11/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/08/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m. | |||
09/02/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2063.) | |||
06/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/26/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/26/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 677.) | |||
03/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 18). | |||
12/16/2008 | Read first time. | |||
12/11/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 10. | |||
12/10/2008 | Introduced. To print. |