California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 1, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009