02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
04/23/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |||
12/16/2008 | Read first time. | |||
12/11/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 10. | |||
12/10/2008 | Introduced. To print. |