|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3190.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2133.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|