|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1980.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2047.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1976.).
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 28). Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|