|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 14.
|
|
|
|
12/12/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|