|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2926.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2023.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Withdrawn from Enrollment. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2385.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1368.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|