|
08/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1533.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|