California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 17, 2009
Bill June 8, 2009