02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
05/21/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13). | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 30). | |||
04/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and G.O. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |