|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). (Page 3112.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1992.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|