08/11/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
08/09/2010 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4400.) | |||
08/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
08/02/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/13/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 820.) | |||
04/02/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |||
03/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
12/16/2008 | Read first time. | |||
12/15/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 14. | |||
12/12/2008 | Introduced. To print. |