|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|