|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1670.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|