|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2160.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1109.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|