|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|