09/10/2009 | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/30/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/30/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1173.) | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 978.). | |||
04/13/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |