02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/22/2009 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/25/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
12/16/2008 | Read first time. | |||
12/15/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 14. | |||
12/12/2008 | Introduced. To print. |