08/09/2010 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
08/02/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 15). | |||
06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1931.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |